Financial history 17th Barrow (St Perran's) Scout Group

Charity number: 521555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £12.90k £13.37k £12.75k £13.24k £14.02k
Total expenditure £9.82k £12.43k £9.01k £21.01k £5.11k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k