3RD ROYTON (ST ANNE'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521665
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 May 2020 14 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2019 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2018 24 July 2019 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 May 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 May 2016 Not Required