Accounts and annual returns 1ST WHISTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521669
Charity reporting is overdue by 110 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 110 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 June 2023 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 September 2022 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 August 2021 201 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 April 2020 79 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required