Financial history 1st Moira and Blackfordby Scouts

Charity number: 521719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £8.97k £10.26k £7.73k £16.60k £14.78k
Total expenditure £8.31k £5.79k £4.85k £3.04k £3.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £11.43k £8.34k