Financial history 68TH LEICESTER BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521751
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £14.28k £15.31k £24.04k £26.66k £40.26k
Total expenditure £14.90k £13.19k £23.63k £29.84k £21.28k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A N/A £18.15k