Financial history 1ST DONISTHORPE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 521772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £10.51k £10.51k £15.75k £12.65k £19.00k
Total expenditure £12.53k £12.53k £4.14k £10.41k £4.82k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £19.00k