Financial history HOLBEACH AND DISTRICT YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 521796
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.90k £2.04k £389 £290 £20
Total expenditure £4.70k £1.43k £688 £688 £5.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A