Financial history SUTTON ST JAMES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521807
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £10.69k £13.64k £13.30k £13.14k £14.05k
Total expenditure £6.69k £30.46k £8.97k £9.14k £5.08k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k