Trustees SUTTON ST JAMES VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521807
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM HARRISON Chair
JOHN WILLIAM AND MARY JANE ALLISON CHARITY
Received: On time
ELAINE JOYCE HARRISON Trustee 27 January 2022
THE SUTTON ST JAMES' FOUNDATION FOR EDUCATION AND THE POOR
Received: On time
ROBERT WRIGHT CHARITY
Received: On time
Kirsty Megan Rose Clifton Trustee 25 January 2021
None on record
Mandy Jayne Hewitt Trustee 22 November 2017
None on record
Paula Van Dyke Trustee 03 November 2016
None on record
Peter George Simpson Trustee 05 November 2015
None on record
Robert J NEWTON Trustee
CHRISTIAN CREATIVITY LTD
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER M GRIGGS Trustee
None on record
Rev Sally Clifton Trustee
None on record