Financial history RAUCEBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 521862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £23.89k £7.60k £8.26k £12.26k £6.36k
Total expenditure £4.25k £7.08k £5.44k £7.58k £12.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A