Financial history GOSFORTH UNIT 396 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 522065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £12.42k £9.92k £7.20k £10.19k £16.40k
Total expenditure £13.67k £10.08k £6.76k £5.73k £20.40k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k