Accounts and annual returns MARDEN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 522122
Charity reporting is overdue by 248 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 248 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 248 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 March 2021 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required