MANSFIELD COLLIERY MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522247
Charity reporting is up to date (58 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £72.89k £70.72k £53.13k £16.14k £70.03k
Total expenditure £50.12k £49.44k £44.86k £44.31k £40.32k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A