CLIFTON MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522268
Charity reporting is overdue by 1672 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2009 28/06/2010 30/06/2011 30/06/2012 30/06/2013
Total gross income £11.72k £13 £13 £13.51k £4.30k
Total expenditure £33.58k £25 £20 £22.50k £12.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A