LONGDEN TERRACE MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 522318
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £39.34k £63.95k £18.07k £8.32k £10.60k
Total expenditure £47.66k £58.49k £22.60k £10.53k £8.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A