Accounts and annual returns GUIDEPOST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522400
Charity reporting is overdue by 148 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 February 2022 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 148 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 February 2021 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 30 June 2019 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required