Financial history GUIDEPOST SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522400
Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.98k £22.59k £43.39k £20.80k £37.50k
Total expenditure £15.08k £18.85k £44.00k £25.11k £8.20k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £22.20k