1ST CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522428
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 26 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2018 17 March 2019 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 31 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2015 04 January 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not Required
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)