1ST CHILWELL AND ATTENBOROUGH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 522428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £9.93k £9.92k £10.90k £21.79k £24.53k
Total expenditure £6.67k £7.91k £11.93k £14.25k £16.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A