Financial history ASHLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 522600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £9.58k £10.95k £7.53k £9.49k £16.98k
Total expenditure £7.63k £13.29k £12.78k £22.26k £9.67k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.14k N/A N/A £10.00k