Financial history WORDSLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £48.91k £56.04k £52.40k £39.83k £72.73k
Total expenditure £43.25k £42.68k £44.56k £44.21k £53.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £29.04k £11.39k