Accounts and annual returns WORDSLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window