THE HAMSTEAD SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 522747
Charity reporting is overdue by 963 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £44.80k £56.27k £35.65k £46.08k £49.64k
Total expenditure £51.20k £55.82k £46.18k £48.37k £50.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0