Financial history THE WALL HEATH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 522810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £17.10k £21.37k £27.60k £27.49k £16.68k
Total expenditure £14.64k £13.05k £19.21k £19.26k £16.24k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £11.33k