Trustees SUTTON COLDFIELD UNIT 42 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 523023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Smith Chair 12 June 2018
None on record
Gil Kanengisser Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Glen Bradbury Trustee 07 October 2020
None on record
Balraj Bhopal Trustee 23 May 2020
None on record
John Byrne Trustee 14 January 2020
None on record
Anthony Taylor Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Amy Ganley Trustee 12 June 2018
None on record
Joshua Walsh Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record