BRICKLEHAMPTON,ELMLEY CASTLE AND NETHERTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 523132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 February 2019 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 20 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required