BRICKLEHAMPTON,ELMLEY CASTLE AND NETHERTON VILLAGE COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 523132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £6.92k £7.16k £4.07k £9.84k £5.60k
Total expenditure £5.91k £6.24k £11.81k £16.05k £9.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A