HAGLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 523146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 February 2018 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 04 February 2018 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 January 2017 On time Download