Financial history HESLINGTON SPORTSFIELD

Charity number: 523247
Charity reporting is overdue by 498 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.33k £7.62k £3.87k £4.75k £22.51k
Total expenditure £16.04k £4.19k £6.22k £5.92k £3.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k N/A N/A N/A £10.00k