Financial history THE CLUB HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 523258
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £16.74k £16.74k £25.38k £25.67k £37.95k
Total expenditure £18.61k £18.61k £28.40k £25.41k £19.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k