Governing document THE CLUB HOUSE COMMUNITY CENTRE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1963 & CONSTITUTION DATED 9 MAY 1944 AS AMENDED 19 MAY 1982, 23 JUNE 1987, 19 NOVEMBER 1990, 16 JUNE 1992, 8 APRIL 1993, 7 OCTOBER 1998, 15 JULY 2002, 16 DECEMBER 2003, 7 APRIL 2004, 9 DECEMBER 2008 AND 30 JUNE 2009.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS.
Area of benefit
UNITARY AUTHORITIES OF KINGSTON UPON HULL, EAST RIDING OF YORKSHIRE, NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE AND NORTH EAST LINCOLNSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.