SINDERBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 20 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 19 February 2020 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 17 January 2018 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required