SINDERBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 523413
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021
Total gross income £3.89k £4.66k £2.71k £8.33k £10.55k
Total expenditure £2.43k £3.48k £2.64k £7.87k £2.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k