ARMTHORPE MINERS' WELFARE RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 02 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 29 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 July 2017 On time Download