Financial history DENABY AND CADEBY MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 523553
Charity reporting is overdue by 229 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £43.17k £147.37k £24.68k £22.09k £24.78k
Total expenditure £27.64k £28.96k £30.11k £31.49k £29.95k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A