Accounts and annual returns FRICKLEY MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523609
Charity reporting is overdue by 1622 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Accounts and TAR 05 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 161 days
Annual return 05 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 526 days
Accounts and TAR 05 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 526 days
Annual return 05 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 891 days
Accounts and TAR 05 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 891 days
Annual return 05 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1256 days
Accounts and TAR 05 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1256 days
Annual return 05 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1622 days
Accounts and TAR 05 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1622 days