Financial history FRICKLEY MINERS' WELFARE SCHEME

Charity number: 523609
Charity reporting is overdue by 1620 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/03/2011 05/03/2012 05/03/2013 05/03/2014 05/03/2015
Total gross income £2.52k £2.70k £2.70k £3.91k £3.22k
Total expenditure £2.05k £1.70k £1.60k £2.00k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A