SHEFFIELD FEDERATION FOR SCHOOL SPORTS

Charity number: 523931
Charity reporting is up to date
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £4.00k £6.67k
Other income £41.09k £29.92k £31.35k £29.07k £26.40k
Total expenditure £33.41k £33.45k £27.04k £25.74k £25.74k