THURGOLAND VILLAGE WELFARE

Charity number: 523970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £22.51k £20.23k £84.76k £26.74k £34.94k
Total expenditure £15.71k £20.84k £67.30k £20.81k £28.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £23.72k £1.65k £15.33k