THURGOLAND VILLAGE WELFARE

Charity number: 523970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 05 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required