Accounts and annual returns MINERS WELFARE RECREATION OR PLEASURE GROUND

Charity number: 523993
Charity reporting is overdue by 840 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 109 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 474 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 840 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 840 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 27 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required