THE WATTSTOWN SOCIAL WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 524239
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k £12.00k
Total expenditure £390 £11.25k £3.22k £1.84k £2.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A