Financial history STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524528
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £76.21k £73.56k £75.69k £65.31k £70.74k
Total expenditure £66.47k £61.10k £80.48k £54.43k £54.86k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £21.33k