Accounts and annual returns STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL STAFFORD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524528
Charity reporting is up to date (72 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 January 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 January 2022 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 21 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 04 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window