Financial history 12TH CITY (TUNSTALL) STOKE-ON-TRENT AND NEWCASTLE SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524534
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £11.62k £9.28k £8.70k £12.48k £11.91k
Total expenditure £11.77k £6.49k £13.59k £12.76k £5.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k