Financial history 1ST HALESOWEN SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £43.15k £54.90k £33.38k £38.95k £26.88k
Total expenditure £49.84k £51.30k £40.85k £33.18k £13.99k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £19.67k