2ND ACOMB (ST STEPHEN'S) BOY SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £27.62k £6.97k £6.16k £14.83k £10.75k
Total expenditure £23.23k £6.44k £8.30k £8.31k £12.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £500 N/A