15TH CARDIFF (ST JOHN'S CANTON) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 524906
Charity reporting is overdue by 1790 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 329 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 695 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 695 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1060 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1060 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1425 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1425 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1790 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1790 days