Financial history TORFAEN SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 524993
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £16.04k £8.47k £18.83k £19.13k £16.51k
Total expenditure £15.55k £6.29k £18.77k £19.93k £15.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A