29TH ORMSKIRK (BURSCOUGH ST JOHN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 525129
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 03 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required